U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-ap-09009-
  • Case Name: DRUMMOND v. TOLLEFSON et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Close Adversary Case]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • January 11, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Dismissing Proceedings]
December, 2020
  • December 13, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service]
  • December 11, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.