U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90244-
  • Case Name: WAYNE B. STERNS and KIMBERLY R. STERNS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
August, 2022
  • August 28, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 28, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Compensation]
  • March 25, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 18, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Employ]
  • January 17, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion to Employ]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Compensation]
  • July 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Stipulation]
  • June 26, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Shorten Time]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • June 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Sell]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
April, 2021
  • April 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Correspondence]
February, 2021
  • February 27, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • February 27, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order (Generic)]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Memorandum of Decision - BK]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Employ]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Employ]
  • February 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Correspondence]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Stipulation]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Stipulation]
  • February 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Expedite Hearing]
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [2004 Examination]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Examination]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • January 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Enlargement of Time to Seek Dismissal or Denial of Discharge]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Time to File Objections to Claims of Exemption Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 4003(b)]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Time to File Objections to Claims of Exemption Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 4003(b)]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Enlargement of Time to Seek Dismissal or Denial of Discharge]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Extend Time]
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.