U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-po-05076-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Sura
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • December 01, 2020: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order - MTD]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Dismiss ]
  • November 18, 2020: [Minute Entry - MT]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • November 17, 2020: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • November 02, 2020: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.