U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-po-05092-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Mcneely
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order - MTD]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • March 08, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • March 05, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order Setting - MTD]
  • December 16, 2020: [Continue ]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • November 03, 2020: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.