U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-ap-00057-
  • Case Name: FOSTER v. FUNDING METRICS, LLC d/b/a QUICK FIX CAPITAL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: FOSTER, JEREMIAH J [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 13, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: FOSTER, JEREMIAH J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • June 11, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: FOSTER, JEREMIAH J [Approving Stipulation]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: FOSTER, JEREMIAH J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 08, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: FOSTER, JEREMIAH J [Extend Time]
  • December 01, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: FOSTER, JEREMIAH J [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: FOSTER, JEREMIAH J [Order (Generic)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.