U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90250-
  • Case Name: MELISSA ANNE PHILLIPS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 26, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • July 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.