U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90251-
  • Case Name: WHITE RIVER CONTRACTING LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • February 09, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
October, 2021
  • October 17, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Entered in Error - BK]
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Disclosure Statement]
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 24, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • July 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
March, 2021
  • March 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 29, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • November 27, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.