U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-ap-02005-
  • Case Name: FRAZIER v. SHEEHAN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Judgment]
  • December 17, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • December 15, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Memorandum of Decision - AD]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 18, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Record of Exhibits]
  • November 18, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Notice - ADV]
  • November 18, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • November 17, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • November 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • November 08, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 06, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.