U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-po-05044-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Guy
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 21, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
February, 2021
  • February 20, 2021: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • February 02, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • February 02, 2021: [Plea Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order Setting - MTD]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • November 18, 2020: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.