U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-po-05012-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Thornock
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • February 25, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • November 18, 2020: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.