U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-po-05096-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Guillen
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 01, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • January 13, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • November 19, 2020: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.