U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40109-
  • Case Name: HARVEY OST OILFIELD SERVICES, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Final Decree]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • May 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • May 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Response to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • April 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order (Generic)]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
February, 2021
  • February 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion]
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion - BK]
January, 2021
  • January 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • November 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.