U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-ap-02014-
  • Case Name: BRANDON v. TAULBEE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 07, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • January 05, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Default Judgment]
  • January 04, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Default Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 20, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 18, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • December 18, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Entry of Default]
  • December 17, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service]
  • December 15, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Withdraw As Attorney For Debtor(s)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.