U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90259-
  • Case Name: JACOB GLENN CLOWARD
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
August, 2021
  • August 15, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
April, 2021
  • April 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order (Generic)]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.