U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-ap-02016-
  • Case Name: WOMACK v. BJERKE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • December 01, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Default Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held Non-evidentiary]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 14, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Default Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 22, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • June 22, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • June 10, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Default Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service]
  • May 19, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 29, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • December 29, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Entry of Default]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.