U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40114-
  • Case Name: GEORGE ATKIN BROWN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 12 Plan]
  • July 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • July 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
May, 2021
  • May 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • May 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Valuation of Secured Claim]
  • April 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Vacate Hearing]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Vacate Hearing]
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • April 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • April 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • March 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Chapter 12 Plan Pre-Confirmation Hearing]
  • March 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Participate in FSA Program]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • December 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Individual/Joint)]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.