U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Treadwell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release - MT]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Transfer Letter - MT]
  • December 04, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 02, 2020: [Rule 5 Documents Other District Deft - SDM]
  • December 02, 2020: [Arrest - Rule 5 - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.