U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10208-
  • Case Name: SHAWN PAUL PETERS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2022
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • August 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Shorten Time]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Shorten Time]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Pay]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Pay]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Pay ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Sale of Property]
  • May 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Sale of Property]
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Notice - BK]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
March, 2021
  • March 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • March 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
February, 2021
  • February 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Sell]
  • January 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Shorten Time]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
  • January 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.