U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-ap-09008-
  • Case Name: DRUMMOND v. YAMAHA MOTOR FINANCE CORPORATION
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 08, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • May 07, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 06, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 06, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Dismissing Proceedings]
  • May 06, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 05, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial]
  • December 09, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Trial]
  • December 09, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.