U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 07-61015-
  • Case Name: ERNEST PETER HOLMQUIST and ARDELL LEATHA HOLMQUIST
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • July 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deeming Claim Satisfied]
  • July 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
June, 2021
  • June 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deeming Claim Satisfied]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Deeming Claim Satisfied (Hearing Required)]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Deeming Claim Satisfied (Hearing Required)]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Turnover]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Turnover]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Turnover]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Reopen]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reopen Case]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Reopen Case - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.