U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90276-
  • Case Name: WILLIAM ERICH KNAUER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
December, 2022
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney]
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • June 06, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
  • June 06, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Withdraw As Attorney For Debtor(s) (With Consents)]
  • June 04, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Withdraw As Attorney For Debtor(s) (With Consents)]
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • May 31, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
November, 2021
  • November 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Withdraw As Attorney For Debtor(s)]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Withdraw As Attorney For Debtor(s)]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.