U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-bk-40001-
  • Case Name: JASON NEWALL ANDREW COLLINS and KARA-LYN CHASE COLLINS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2022
  • April 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • February 04, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • August 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • August 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.