U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05036-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Mcgowen
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Mail Returned - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Mail Returned - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Quash ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Payment Rescheduled (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • June 29, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Defendant Correspondence (Updates CVB) - SDM]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
  • January 21, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
  • January 06, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • January 06, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.