U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05035-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 25, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
  • July 16, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • April 06, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • March 08, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • January 06, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.