U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05034-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Jansen
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Payment Rescheduled (Updates CVB) - MT]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Vacate]
  • January 22, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
  • January 21, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
  • January 14, 2021: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • January 06, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • January 06, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.