U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05048-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Trivedi
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • March 09, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 08, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
  • March 08, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • February 25, 2021: [Vacate]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • January 22, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • January 08, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • January 08, 2021: [Appear]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 08, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.