U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-bk-10002-
  • Case Name: JOHN DEAN DEVITT, JR. and LAURA LEIGH ROSS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
May, 2021
  • May 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
February, 2021
  • February 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Conduct Appraisal]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Conduct Appraisal]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Conduct Appraisal]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Valuation of Secured Claim]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.