U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-bk-90005-
  • Case Name: ANN MARIE JORDAN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
April, 2021
  • April 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • April 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.