U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-mj-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • February 05, 2021: [Transfer Letter - MT]
  • February 02, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
  • February 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Other District Deft - SDM]
  • January 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 29, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Other District Deft - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.