U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-ap-09001-
  • Case Name: WARD v. WHITE RIVER CONTRACTING LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2021
  • October 17, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 15, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Entered in Error - BK]
  • October 15, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Approving Stipulation]
  • October 09, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 07, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • October 07, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • September 14, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Continue Hearing - ADV]
  • September 12, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • September 12, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ]
  • September 10, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Memorandum of Decision - AD]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 16, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • May 14, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • May 13, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • May 12, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Notice of Undeliverable Electronic Notice]
  • May 12, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Generic Motion - ADV]
  • May 11, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • April 23, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Answer]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 29, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • March 26, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 12, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.