U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-bk-20013-
  • Case Name: SHAUNA RAE FOLLETTE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • March 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.