U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-mc-00002
  • Case Name: In re Paul Red Eagle
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Mail Returned]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • February 23, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • February 22, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • February 17, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • February 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • February 08, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.