U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-mj-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alires
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Transfer Letter - MT]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • February 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • February 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 09, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5 - SDM]
  • February 09, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Other District Deft - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.