U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-mj-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abdi
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • June 30, 2021: [Extradition Hearing]
  • June 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 16, 2021: [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 25, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 25, 2021: [Status Conference ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 16, 2021: [Remark - MT]
  • February 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 16, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • February 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.