U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05088-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Zappa
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • April 09, 2021: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Vacate]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • March 08, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • March 05, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • February 17, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.