U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05057-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Lamarr
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order - MTD]
  • July 15, 2021: [Bench Trial - Held - SDM]
  • July 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Dismiss ]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • March 08, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • March 05, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • February 17, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.