U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05091-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Matoon
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • April 08, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • March 08, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • February 18, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.