U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05090-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Martin
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Forfeiture of Collateral]
  • March 09, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 08, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
  • March 05, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • February 18, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.