U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shourds
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 25, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.