U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stowers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 16, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 13, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • July 13, 2021: [Trial Brief ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • July 13, 2021: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Use JERS - MT]
  • July 09, 2021: [Stipulation - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.