U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • January 05, 2022: [Revoke]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • October 14, 2021: [Revoke]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 15, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • June 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • June 23, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • June 17, 2021: [Revoke]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.