U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Menz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 06, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 16, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 24, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 16, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 14, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Appear]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 02, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 31, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 26, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 10, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • March 10, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.