U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 24, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 31, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 31, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 31, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.