U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stremel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 29, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 29, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 26, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 26, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 26, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 25, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 23, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 13, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 05, 2021: [Bond Hearing - SDM]
  • May 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • April 15, 2021: [Revoke]
  • April 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 23, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 23, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • March 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Quash ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.