U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Odom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 28, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 11, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 11, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 04, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 29, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 09, 2021: [Quash ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.