U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Voorhies
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [USCA Memorandum - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 02, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 02, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 28, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 19, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • May 11, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 26, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • April 26, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 26, 2021: [Suppress ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.