U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woodcock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 10, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report (Addenda) - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 30, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 09, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 14, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 14, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 05, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 05, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 05, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.