U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cadotte
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 25, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • March 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • March 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 05, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 05, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.