U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mondragon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 05, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • July 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 11, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 05, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.