U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:07-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Dismiss ]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 08, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.